THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:51:15 AM
Otero Fuentes, Carmen Gloria
CPSO#:
72923
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 Jul 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Catholic University of Chile, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Juravinski Hospital and Cancer
Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 43897
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Norfolk General Hospital |
Simcoe |
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital |
Grimsby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:29 Jul 2002 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jun 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Sep 2008 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 29 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Nov 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Nov 2012 |
|
Active |