THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:52:33 AM
Bilbily, Ghassan Fahmi Yacoub
CPSO#:
72897
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Aug 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Yacoub, Ghassan Fahmi (used until: 09 Jan 2005 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Maple Endoscopy
9100 Jane Street
Building A , Suite 105
Vaughan ON L4K 0A4
Phone: (905) 482-3387
Fax: (905) 760-5587
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jul 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:26 Oct 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GHASSAN FAHMI YACOUB BILBILY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILBILY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 08 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 09 Jul 1999 to 08 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2000 to 08 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2001 to 08 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 08 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2002 |