THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:04:02 AM
Darrat, Mahmoud Abdelmuneim
CPSO#:
72895
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Mar 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Mar 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Al-Arab Medical University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44890
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:08 Jul 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAHMOUD ABDELMUNEIM DARRAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DARRAT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 08 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 09 Jul 1999 to 08 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 09 Jul 2000 to 08 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 09 Jul 2001 to 08 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 09 Jul 2002 to 08 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Jul 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2004 |