THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:03:10 AM
Nimni, Gil Baroh
CPSO#:
72894
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7155 Woodbine Ave
Markham ON L3R 1A3
Phone: 416-789-2449
Fax: 416-789-2253
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:29 Nov 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GIL BAROH NIMNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIMNI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 09 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 10 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1999 |