THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 12:43:40 PM
Ben Musa, Anas Ahmed T
CPSO#:
72892
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Feb 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Mary's General Hospital
Cardio-Vascular Surgery Department
Critical Care Medicine
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON N2M1B3
Phone: 5197443311 Ext. 6428
Fax: (905) 306-7607
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:23 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANAS AHMED T BEN MUSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN MUSA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2004 to 30 Apr 2005
CF - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 15 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Apr 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 May 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 May 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2007 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Feb 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: July 19, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)