THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 11:25:03 AM
Chang, Derrick
CPSO#:
72888
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Fell Pavillion 1 503
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5405
Fax: (516) 603-5324
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Dec 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DERRICK CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 06 Jul 1998 to 19 Aug 1998
EL - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Aug 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1999 |