THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 15:48:55 PM
Azabi, Tareq Omar S
CPSO#:
72883
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Feb 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Feb 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300G Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0E6
Phone: 9056850821
Fax: 9056851175
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:06 Jul 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TAREQ OMAR S AZABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZABI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 06 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 07 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 06 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 07 Jul 2000 to 06 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 07 Jul 2001 to 06 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 07 Jul 2002 to 06 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2004 |