THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:40:48 PM
De Ruiter, Joost Matthys
CPSO#:
72857
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 May 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 May 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Cambridge School of Clinic, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5224
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ellis-De Ruiter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital |
Toronto |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 May 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOOST MATTHYS DE RUITER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE RUITER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 19 Oct 1999
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1999 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2002 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2002 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 27 Jun 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 May 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2007 |