THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:42:10 PM
Thomas, Karen Elizabeth
CPSO#:
72843
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 Feb 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Di, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:16 May 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 2001 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Feb 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Jul 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Feb 2022 |