THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 4:52:17 AM
Hall Barber, Karen Patricia
CPSO#:
72831
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jul 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hall, Karen Patricia (used until: 11 Jul 2007 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University
Queen's Family Health Team
Team 2 West A
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON K7L 5E9
Phone: (613) 533-9300 Ext. 0
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Jun 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAREN PATRICIA HALL BARBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL BARBER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1998 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Aug 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2007 |