THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 6:06:28 AM
Dharmalingam, Sudharshan
CPSO#:
72810
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Mar 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Mar 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Manitoba, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
307 - 164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON L6V 1B4
Phone: (905) 451-2967
Fax: (905) 595-0204
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:05 Sep 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUDHARSHAN DHARMALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHARMALINGAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 28 Jul 1998
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jul 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 2001 |