THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:48:13 AM
Nguyen, Xong Thi
CPSO#:
72801
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
22 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Vietnamese
Education: Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Xong Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 19 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Jun 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: April 5, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)