THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:35:27 AM
Woods, Si-Ann Helen Lee
CPSO#:
72792
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue A6
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4581
Fax: (613) 761-5328
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SI-ANN HELEN LEE WOODS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |