THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:35:35 AM
Choi, Stephen Bernard
CPSO#:
72778
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Dec 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Dec 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79002
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHEN BERNARD CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2003 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2005 |