THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:27:07 AM
Petroz, Guy Christian
CPSO#:
72772
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Jul 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German
Education: University of Geneva, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Dept of Anesthesia & Pain Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Fax: (416) 813-7543
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Switzerland
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:09 Jul 2001 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2001 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jun 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
|
Active |