THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:33:34 PM
Radhakrishnan, Arun Kumar
CPSO#:
72771
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Tamil
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1770 Woodward Drive
Suite 100
Ottawa ON K2C 3J2
Phone: (613) 755-2095
Fax: (613) 731-6201
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARUN KUMAR RADHAKRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADHAKRISHNAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2002 |