THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:54:40 AM
Shin, Vincent Ho-Sun
CPSO#:
72739
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6076
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VINCENT HO-SUN SHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2003 |