THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:18:20 AM
Miller, Paul Christopher
CPSO#:
72730
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Perth and Smith Falls District
Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON K7A 2H9
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital |
Perth |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site |
Smiths Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL CHRISTOPHER MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2000 to 22 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 2000 |