THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 13:47:14 PM
Reaume, Martin Neil
CPSO#:
72696
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Oct 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70166
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:07 Sep 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTIN NEIL REAUME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REAUME is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 1999 |