THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:28:13 AM
Bindlish, Rajiv
CPSO#:
72693
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Aug 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Aug 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Eye Associates
Unit A2
2330 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON L6L 6M1
Phone: (905) 469-6666
Fax: (905) 469-3171
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:23 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAJIV BINDLISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BINDLISH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 29 Jun 1998 to 24 Jul 1998
EL - Ophthalmology
McMaster University, 29 Mar 1999 to 09 Apr 1999
EL - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Jul 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Apr 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 1999 |