THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:41:03 AM
Popiel, Stephanie Yolande Sophie Anne
CPSO#:
72687
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: University of Toronto, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
39 Drummond Street West
Perth ON K7H 2J9
Phone: (613) 264-2686
Fax: (613) 264-0454
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital |
Perth |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jul 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE YOLANDE SOPHIE ANNE POPIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPIEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 22 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 23 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2001 |