THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:33:10 AM
Lian, Calvin Tai-Ien
CPSO#:
72686
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Mar 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin, Spanish
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
R. Faser Elliott Building
Ground Floor
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3947
Fax: (416) 340-5466
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Dec 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CALVIN TAI-IEN LIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1998 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 2013 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Nov 2012
Summary:
On November 26, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Calvin TaiIen Lian committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise. Dr. Lian admitted the allegation.
Dr. Lian is a family physician practising emergency medicine in Toronto, Ontario.
On December 22, 2009, Dr. Lian pleaded to and was found guilty of one count of assault under section 266 of the Criminal Code in relation to an assault on his wife. He received a conditional discharge, contingent upon 18 months' probation. Prior to the 2009 assault which is the subject of this proceeding, Dr. Lian pleaded guilty to assault in relation to an assault on his wife in 2002, for which he received an absolute discharge.
Dr. Lian entered into individual and marital counselling in October 2009.
The Committee ordered and directed that:
( the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Lian's certificate of registration until the term referred to in paragraph (a) below has been completed:
(a) Dr. Lian shall participate in and successfully complete an educational program in ethics facilitated by the College, relating to the ethical issues raised by his misconduct, such program to be completed at the earliest opportunity and in any case not later than within six (6) months of the date of this Order, with Dr. Lian to provide proof of successful completion of the program to the College within that time;
(b) Dr. Lian shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing this term of this Order.
( Dr. Lian appear before it to be reprimanded.
( Dr. Lian pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 26, 2012