THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:58:58 AM
Kabir, Atif
CPSO#:
72680
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Dec 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Dec 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French, Urdu
Education: University of Ottawa, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Athlete's Care
1595 Merivale Road, Unit 1A-2
Ottawa ON K2G 3J4
Phone: (613) 688 3184
Fax: (613) 224 6847
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Dec 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ATIF KABIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KABIR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 24 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 15 Nov 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 16 Nov 1999 to 13 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Nov 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2000 |