THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:52:10 AM
Vohra, Anita
CPSO#:
72675
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Oct 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 801-1004
Fax: (416) 977-0974
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:04 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANITA VOHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOHRA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2004 |