THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 4:02:46 AM
Jain, Neelesh Kumar
CPSO#:
72674
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hindi
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street, Suite GS-71a
HOSPITAL-BASED. NO OUTPT REFERRALS.
REFERRAL OF FORMER PTS IS WELCOME.
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (647) 693-8499
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:09 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEELESH KUMAR JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2005 |