THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 11:07:39 AM
Gillis, Lisa Anne
CPSO#:
72670
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Lisa Gillis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 12 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
North Woodlands Medical Centre
204-40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON N3S 0C5
Date Received: 03 Dec 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2019 |