THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:35:30 AM
Sharkawy, Abdul Quadir Ahmed
CPSO#:
72661
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Sep 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medicine
8th Floor East Wing Room 418
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 2587
Fax: (416) 603-6495
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:10 Sep 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDUL QUADIR AHMED SHARKAWY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARKAWY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2002 to 27 Jun 2002
EL - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2004 |