THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:34:31 AM
Zinman, Lorne Howard
CPSO#:
72655
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Hospital
M1 600
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4475
Fax: (416) 480-4674
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LORNE HOWARD ZINMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZINMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2003 |