THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:48:46 AM
Flynn, Christopher Andrew
CPSO#:
72638
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Apr 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Apr 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
2200 Eglington Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200 Ext. 3946
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANDREW FLYNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLYNN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2007 |