THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:41:30 PM
Duggan, Scott Stanley
CPSO#:
72631
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:20 May 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SCOTT STANLEY DUGGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGGAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 04 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 05 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 2004 |