THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:52:09 PM
Chan, David Kwok Wai
CPSO#:
72609
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Suite 923
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-5474
Fax: (416) 864-5473
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID KWOK WAI CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |