THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:31:48 AM
Bilotta, Rosetta
CPSO#:
72602
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
9100 Jane St., Unit 18, Bldg B
Vaughan ON L4K 0A4
Phone: (647) 986-4357
Fax: (416) 913-4357
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROSETTA BILOTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILOTTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2000 |