THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:28:34 AM
Huntington, Katrina Deanne
CPSO#:
72574
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Feb 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Feb 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1804
Highway 2E
Brockville ON K6V 5W7
Phone: (613) 341-2870
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre |
Brockville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATRINA DEANNE HUNTINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNTINGTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2004 |