THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 4:03:01 AM
Razvi, Nayyar Kamal
CPSO#:
72573
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Ottawa, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4062 Confederation Pky
Mississauga ON L5B 0G4
Phone: 647 722 2273
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Nayyar Razvi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 22 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jul 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAYYAR KAMAL RAZVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZVI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 15 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2000 |