THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:01:57 PM
Manohar, Advaitanand
CPSO#:
72569
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Nov 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Mar 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Manohar, A Vaito (used until: 01 Dec 2016 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7A 7700 Pine Valley Drive
Woodbridge ON L4L 2X4
Phone: (905) 851-1234
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: A.V. Manohar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 8 2006
Corporation Name: A Manohar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADVAITANAND MANOHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOHAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2000 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2005 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 05 Oct 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2016 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Oct 2006
Summary:
On October 5, 2006, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. A Vaito Manohar to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient, engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, and that he engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician. The Discipline Committee ordered and directed:
1. Directs the Registrar to revoke Dr. Manohar(s certificate of registration effective immediately.
2. Requires that Dr. Manohar appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. Requires that Dr. Manohar reimburse the College for funding provided for the complainant under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code.
4. Requires Dr. Manohar to post security acceptable to the College to guarantee the payment of any amounts Dr. Manohar may be required to reimburse the College pursuant to paragraph 3 above.
5. Requires Dr. Manohar to pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 05, 2006
Application for Reinstatement
Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
Decision Date: 18 Jun 2014
Decision: Application Accepted