THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 16:29:43 PM
Talwar, Manoj Kumar
CPSO#:
72534
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jun 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
205-1144 Wilson St W
Ancaster ON L9G 3K9
Phone: 519-721-4598
Fax: 519-742-6571
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: March 20, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On March 25, 2020, Grand River Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Schedule II to the Regulated Health Professions Act, and section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act, that the privileges held by Dr. Manoj Kumar Talwar at Grand River Hospital and St. Mary's General Hospital were suspended, effective March 20, 2020.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiothoracic Surgery |
Effective:05 Sep 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Surgery |
Effective:09 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MANOJ KUMAR TALWAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALWAR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1998 |