THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 12:04:24 PM
Baldauf, Christian Gerd Gotthard
CPSO#:
72518
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German
Education: University of Ottawa, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Box 1800
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2297
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN GERD GOTTHARD BALDAUF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALDAUF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |