THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:58:16 AM
Guy, Kurt James
CPSO#:
72516
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 104
386 Cambria Street
Stratford ON N5A 1J4
Phone: (519) 272-1811
Fax: (519) 272-1822
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KURT JAMES GUY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |