Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Dec 2013
Summary:
On December 13, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Jeffrey Steven Gale committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he sexually abused a patient, and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Gale denied the allegations.
Dr. Gale is an ophthalmologist. He participated in the hiring of a young female patient, Ms X, to work as his family’s live in nanny. The medical issues for which Ms X was under the care of Dr. Gale were significant and ongoing.
After hiring Ms X, Dr. Gale developed a personal and flirtatious relationship with her which was inappropriate for him to have had with a patient. It included taking hot tubs and watching television together. He also allowed for utterances of a sexual nature with this patient and engaged in a pattern of sexualized interaction which was inappropriate.
During the doctor-patient relationship, Dr. Gale and Ms X had an intimate sexual relationship which involved oral sex and sexual intercourse.
On March 4, 2014, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
• the Registrar revoke Dr. Gale’s certificate of registration effective immediately.
• Dr. Gale appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
• Dr. Gale reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College within 30 days of this Order, in the amount of $16,060.00.
• Dr. Gale pay costs to the College in the amount of $44,600.00 within 30 days of this
Order.
On April 4, 2014, Dr. Gale appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). In the circumstances, the decision of the Discipline Committee remains in effect despite the appeal.
On March 25, 2015, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Gale’s appeal.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 2015-03-25
Hearing Date(s): January 28-February 1, February 4-8, 2013