THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:40:42 PM
Dang, Tommy Tue Minh
CPSO#:
72481
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Oct 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Oct 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Vietnamese
Education: University of Ottawa, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300-1100 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1C9
Phone: 519-999-8586
Fax: 1-888-356-3055
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: December 2, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On December 2, 2021, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, that Windsor Regional Hospital suspended Dr. Tommy Tue Minh Dang’s hospital privileges effective October 7, 2021 due to failure to comply with hospital policy.
On December 17, 2021, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College that Dr. Tommy Tue Minh Dang resigned his hospital privileges as of December 14, 2021 in lieu of further steps by the hospital in connection with his failure to comply with hospital policy.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:24 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TOMMY TUE MINH DANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 07 Mar 2005
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Mar 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Oct 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2005 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: September 30, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)