THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:06:22 AM
Johnson, Christopher Benjamin
CPSO#:
72479
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Department of Medicine
Division of Cardiology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8582
Fax: (613) 737-8918
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:29 Sep 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER BENJAMIN JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2003 |