THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:52:25 AM
Joshi, Vivek Raman
CPSO#:
72474
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Feb 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
195 County Court Blvd
Suite 100
Brampton ON L6W 4P7
Phone: 905-799-1850 Ext. 3
Fax: 905-799-3129
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Nov 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:12 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIVEK RAMAN JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 1999 |