THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:02:28 PM
Ruggles, David James MacLeod
CPSO#:
72473
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
752 King St. West
Kimgston
Kingston ON K7L4X3
Phone: (613) 544 4900 Ext. 53286
Fax: (613) 544-4614
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. David Ruggles Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 9 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID JAMES MACLEOD RUGGLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUGGLES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Mar 2008 |