THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:48:54 AM
Dief, Stewart Hanna
CPSO#:
72471
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Nov 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hanna Dief, Sarwat Kamel (used until: 10 Sep 2014 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
106-3292 Bayview Ave
North York ON M2M 4J5
Phone: 905-758-2592
Fax: 647-556-05622
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEWART HANNA DIEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIEF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 13 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 28 Jun 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2022 |