THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 17:19:03 PM
Johnson, Sindhu Rose
CPSO#:
72469
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Sep 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Rheumatology
Toronto Western Hospital
Ground Floor East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6417
Fax: (416) 603-4348
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:11 Sep 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SINDHU ROSE JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2002 |