THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:36:47 AM
Sheldon, Patricia Elisa
CPSO#:
72442
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Van Boekel, Patricia Elisa (used until: 08 Jan 2024 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Stratford Rotary Complex
Room 136-353 McCarthy Rd.
Stratford ON N5A 7S7
Phone: (519) 271-3030
Fax: (519)271-3038
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:27 Nov 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PATRICIA ELISA SHELDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHELDON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2000 |