THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:09:38 PM
Orovec, Natalie Marija
CPSO#:
72417
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Dec 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Dec 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Orovec, Natalie (used until: 04 Dec 2002 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Main Street
McMaster Children's Hospital - Hami
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 318-6051
Fax: (905) 318-0118
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: N. Orovec Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Nov 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATALIE MARIJA OROVEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OROVEC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 2002 |