THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:44:08 AM
Stothart, Tonja Lee
CPSO#:
72411
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton
Emergency Department
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-4710
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Tonja Stothart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 12 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Mar 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TONJA LEE STOTHART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOTHART is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 10 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 10 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Mar 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2004 |