THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:39:46 AM
Lodenquai, Gregory Michael
CPSO#:
72404
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
George Hull Centre for
Children and Families
81 The East Mall
3rd Floor
Toronto ON M8Z 5W3
Phone: (416) 622-8833 Ext. 227
Fax: (416) 622-7068
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GREGORY MICHAEL LODENQUAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LODENQUAI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 09 Sep 2003 to 08 Sep 2004
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |