THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:21:43 AM
Claveau, Richard Lucien
CPSO#:
72403
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Dec 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 1570
1403 Edward Street
Hearst ON P0L 1N0
Phone: (705) 362-7511
Fax: (705) 362-7161
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) |
Hearst |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Dec 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD LUCIEN CLAVEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLAVEAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2000 to 19 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2000 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2020 |